judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00806-CR
14-89-00806-CR
08/29/1989
Other Felony
Abbott, Frederick H.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1990Case stored
11/21/1990Mandate Issued
11/21/1990Mandate Issued
11/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
08/14/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/02/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/18/1990Submitted
07/18/1990Submission
07/18/1990Submitted
01/30/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/30/1990Case ready to be set
01/30/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/14/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/14/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STADENIED
12/01/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/01/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/02/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/23/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/19/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
10/18/1989No description available.
10/16/1989Transcript FILED
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Date of Sentence
08/18/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantR. P. Cornelius
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasKimberly Aperauch Stelter
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable NORMAN EUGENE LANFORD
510,594
10 years TDC/$5,000.