judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9002
C-9002
08/29/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
TRANS PACIFIC STORES d/b/a RUSSELL'S
THE HONORABLE DAVIE L. WILSON JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/26/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentREAL PARTIES; JUDITH RIGGIN
09/22/1989Supplement to Petition filedRelatorVERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT
09/19/1989Motion for RehearingRelator
09/07/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent
08/29/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/09/1989Case StoredREHEARING OVERRULED
10/04/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
09/26/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedREAL PARTIES; JUDITH RIGGIN
09/22/1989Supplement to Petition filedVERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT
09/19/1989Motion for Rehearing
09/19/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
09/07/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
08/29/1989Brief in Support of Petition
08/29/1989Exhibits receivedTRANS OF TRIAL COURT PROCEEDINGS
08/29/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/29/1989No description available.
08/29/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/09/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EVAN SCOTT CARRRespondentMr. Harold L. Sosebee Jr.
JUDITH RIGGINRespondentMr. Craig D. Ball
Court of Appeals Information:
01-89-00347-CV
Overruled
Rule 90, 06-15-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable David V. Wilson
87-58535