judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01017-CR
05-89-01017-CR
08/29/1989
All Misdemeanors
Almond, Richard C.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
10/09/2000Record RetentionDestroy
04/05/1990Mandate Issued
04/05/1990Mandate Issued
02/05/1990Order EnteredDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
02/05/1990Order EnteredDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
01/04/1990Letter Sent by the Court
10/31/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/11/1989Transcript Filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/24/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court of Appeals No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Kenneth Vaughan
MC89-A7512-D
$100 Fine