judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00809-CR
14-89-00809-CR
08/29/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Heavin, Robert Allan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/12/1992Case stored
01/29/1992Mandate Issued
01/29/1992Mandate Issued
01/14/1992Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/11/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/07/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/30/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/13/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
08/29/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/29/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/29/1991Post submission brief FILED - ANT,APE
04/03/1991Submitted
04/03/1991Submission
04/03/1991Submitted
03/08/1991Submission
02/13/1991Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/13/1991Case ready to be set
02/13/1991Case ready to be set
01/24/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/09/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/20/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/11/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/15/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/01/1990Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
10/29/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/29/1990No description available.
10/04/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/24/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/13/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/28/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/16/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/16/1990Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
08/10/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/10/1990Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
08/09/1990No description available.
07/26/1990Order Entered
06/25/1990No description available.
05/24/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/24/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
05/21/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/21/1990Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/19/1990Order Entered
03/13/1990No description available.
02/01/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP
01/09/1990No description available.
12/21/1989Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/21/1989Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STAGRANTED
12/21/1989Order withdrawn
12/11/1989Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
12/11/1989Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA
11/30/1989Order Entered
11/16/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/07/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/24/1989No description available.
10/20/1989Transcript FILED
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/24/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/23/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/12/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHenry L. Burkholder, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DONALD K. SHIPLEY
502,419
Life