judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARAJAS (NABOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31489
Short Caption:BARAJAS (NABOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138977Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/17/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/05/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31416, 31486, 31487, 31489, 31527, 31671, 31672, 31735, 31736.
04/29/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For Leave to Proceed in Proper Person.
04/29/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
06/17/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
06/17/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/01/1999BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
09/15/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For Appointment of Counsel. (Received the original and 3 copies - 1 copy returned.)
03/02/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03872
03/28/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03911
03/28/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2001. 01-03911