judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00244-CR
11-89-00244-CR
08/29/1989
Burglary
Yarborough, Garland Keith
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/11/1991Mandate issued
05/31/1991Case returned from higher court
05/01/1991Opinion issuedDismissed
09/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1990Case forwarded to higher court
06/11/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/ Reversed & Remanded
04/12/1990Submitted
04/12/1990Submission set in Eastland
01/16/1990Case ready to be set
01/16/1990Brief filed
01/16/1990Submission set in Eastland
12/14/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
11/21/1989Brief filed
11/02/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
09/27/1989SF filed
09/13/1989TR filed
08/29/1989We send letter to lawyers, etc.
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/01/1989Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Yarborough, Garland KeithCriminal - AppellantDavid Adkins
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJack G. Willingham
Eddie L. Meaders
Trial Court Information
259th District Court
Jones
Honorable Quay F. Parker, Senior Judge
6576
45 Years TDC