judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01019-CR
05-89-01019-CR
08/29/1989
Robbery
Busby, Keith Earl
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/07/2008Letter received
06/28/2008Letter issued by the court
06/26/2008Letter received
06/02/2008Letter received
04/15/2008Letter issued by the court
09/27/2007Letter issued by the court
09/24/2007Letter received
10/12/1992Mandate Issued
10/12/1992Mandate Issued
07/29/1992Record RetentionRetain
07/29/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/29/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1992Submitted
04/20/1992Submission
04/20/1992Submitted
02/05/1992Response to Motion
02/03/1992Letter Sent by the Court
11/15/1991Case ready to be set
11/15/1991Supplemental Brief Filed
11/15/1991Case ready to be set
10/21/1991Supplemental Brief Filed
10/10/1991Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1991Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
09/04/1991Order EnteredReinstate Appeal
09/04/1991Case reinstated
08/20/1991Statement of Facts Filed
07/15/1991Response to Motion
07/09/1991Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed
07/05/1991Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
05/01/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
12/06/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/06/1990En Banc Review
11/06/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/23/1990Opinion issuedAbated
10/23/1990Opinion issuedAbated
10/03/1990Submitted
10/03/1990Submission
10/03/1990Submission
10/03/1990Submitted
09/04/1990MattConv
05/16/1990Brief Filed
05/16/1990Case ready to be set
05/16/1990Case ready to be set
05/09/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Brief Filed
01/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/01/1989Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts
10/23/1989Transcript Filed
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1992Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Ron Chapman
F85-86174-JH
Life, TDC