judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9003
C-9003
08/29/1989
App Writ Err - Cause (2 Applications)
LISA VAWTER
FRANK GARVEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/05/1990Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerON BEHALF OF LISA VAWTER (BRIEF RECD 01-29-90 WITH NO FEES)
09/14/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF FRANK GARVEY
09/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/25/1990Cost letter issued$75 GRANT FEE OWING.
04/10/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksONLY TWO (2) COPIES EACH OF ANT'S BR., APE'S BR. & BOTH MO/RE'S WHEN RECORD WAS SEPARATED
04/10/1990Mandate issuedNO REHEARING FILED 786 SW2D 263
03/09/1990cover ltr with jmt
03/07/1990Application for Writ of Error - Disposedsee former trap 133AS SUPPLEMENTED/BEHALF L.VAWTER
03/07/1990Application for Writ of Error - Disposedsee former trap 133BEHALF/FRANK GARVEY
03/07/1990Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsPER CURIAM OPINION 786 SW2D 263
03/07/1990Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
02/05/1990Supplemental Brief filedON BEHALF OF LISA VAWTER (BRIEF RECD 01-29-90 WITH NO FEES)
09/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/14/1989No description available.
09/14/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF FRANK GARVEY
09/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/10/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00222-CV
Reverse
774 SW2d 86, 06-22-89
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable DON BURGESS
Trial Court Information
75th District Court
Liberty
Honorable Clarence D. Cain
41,004