judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00877-CR
01-89-00877-CR
08/29/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Morales, Andrew Joseph
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/27/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/11/1990Date final opinion release for publication
07/07/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/22/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
01/26/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/03/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
12/07/1989Statement of facts filed
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/16/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/10/1989Transcript filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/22/1989Notice of appeal filed
08/15/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasLester Blizzard
StateCriminal - AppellantJohn W. Batchan Jr.
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. Carol Davies
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
509,598
life