judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00207-CR
09-89-00207-CR
08/29/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Roberts, Richard Carlton
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/15/1989Mandate Issued
10/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
10/27/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/24/1989Letter
09/29/1989Letter
09/25/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/18/1989Letter
08/29/1989Transcript Filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/15/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
89-02-139 CR
dismissed