judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01024-CR
05-89-01024-CR
08/29/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Reid, Mario King
Texas, The State of
No
9th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/1995Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
01/08/1991Mandate Issued
01/08/1991Mandate Issued
10/31/1990Record RetentionRetain
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/16/1990Submission
10/16/1990Submitted
10/16/1990Submission
10/16/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
05/01/1990Brief Filed
05/01/1990Case ready to be set
05/01/1990Case ready to be set
04/17/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/05/1990Brief Filed
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1989Transcript Filed
10/04/1989Exhibits Filed
10/04/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
203rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Thomas Thorpe
F89-79000-T
Life, TDC & $10,000 Fine