judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PARKER (ALBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31486
Short Caption:PARKER (ALBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126477Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/15/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/05/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31416, 31486, 31487, 31489, 31527, 31671, 31672, 31735, 31736.
06/15/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
06/15/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19997
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20127
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20127