judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00816-CV
14-89-00816-CV
08/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Rogers, Tanya Renee
Aldrich, Jesse, Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/21/1990Case stored
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
11/16/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
09/05/1990Submission
02/27/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/01/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/18/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/17/1990Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
01/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/28/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
12/11/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/10/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/28/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
09/13/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
08/30/1989Transcript FILED
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/13/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/16/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Reginald E. Mullins
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. William Keaton Blackburn
Trial Court Information
306th District Court
Galveston
88FD2122