judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00815-CR
14-89-00815-CR
08/30/1989
Other Felony
Alva, Marcus
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1991Case stored
01/23/1991Mandate Issued
01/23/1991Mandate Issued
01/08/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
11/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/14/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS REFORMED
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS REFORMED
08/29/1990Submitted
08/29/1990Submission
08/29/1990Submitted
07/26/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
07/26/1990No description available.
07/23/1990Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
11/15/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/15/1989Case ready to be set
11/15/1989Case ready to be set
11/02/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/20/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/22/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/31/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
08/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
05/18/1984Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasMary Lou Keel
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantAllen C. Isbell
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DONALD K. SHIPLEY
397,134
8 years TDC