judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1206-89
PD-1206-89
08/30/1989
PDR Case Type
COPELAND, FOSTER DARRELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/03/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/30/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTom O''Connell
COPELAND, FOSTER DARRELLApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)George Roland
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00123-CR
Aff 7-12-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
199th District Court
Collin
199-10040-87