judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1204-89
PD-1204-89
08/30/1989
PDR Case Type
DOUCHETTE, JAMES THOMAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/16/1990MANDATE ISSD
01/31/1990DISMISS MOTION TOGranted
01/31/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed
12/08/1989DISMISS MOTION TOFiled
12/04/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/08/1989PDR DISPGranted
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/03/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
08/30/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/16/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DOUCHETTE, JAMES THOMASApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mark Morefield
STATE OF TEXASStateMichael R. Little
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00025-CR
Rev & Rem 6-28-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
75th District Court
Liberty
Honorable Clarence D. Cain
17,118