judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00876-CR
01-89-00876-CR
08/29/1989
Other Felony
Barnes, Bonny
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/10/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/10/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/19/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
01/04/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/28/1990Submitted
11/28/1990Submission
11/28/1990Submitted
10/11/1990Submission
07/31/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/31/1990Case ready to be set
07/31/1990Case ready to be set
07/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/02/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/07/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/07/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/29/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/19/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/09/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/05/1990Brief due for retained counsel
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/07/1989Statement of facts filed
11/21/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/24/1989Transcript filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/25/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/10/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantConnie B. Williams
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable EDWARD W. AUSTIN
4733300
10 yrs tdc