judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Dale Steenrod v. Cathlene Pidgeon

Case: 03-22-00659-CV
03-22-00659-CV
10/19/2022
Divorce
Dale Steenrod
Cathlene Pidgeon
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
07/03/2023Reply brief filedAppellant
05/12/2023Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/15/2023Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
02/13/2023Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
09/20/2023Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/14/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
09/12/2023Document filed
09/08/2023Response filed
09/01/2023Motion to abate appeal filed
07/03/2023Reply brief filed
06/15/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2023Motion received
06/13/2023Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
06/12/2023Case ready to be set
05/12/2023Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/12/2023Case reinstated
04/11/2023Supplemental reporters record filed
04/07/2023Email received
04/07/2023Telephone inquiry to or from the court
04/06/2023Memorandum opinion issuedAbated
04/06/2023Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/03/2023Motion filed
03/30/2023Supplemental reporters record filed
03/30/2023Supplemental reporters record received
03/20/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
03/10/2023Supplemental reporters record filed
03/07/2023Notice filed
02/28/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/23/2023Appearance of counsel
02/15/2023Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/13/2023Brief received - oral argument not requested
01/09/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/12/2022Exhibits filed
12/12/2022Reporters record filed
12/09/2022Supplemental clerks record filed
11/21/2022Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
11/18/2022Clerks record filed
10/31/2022Letter received
10/19/2022Docketing statement filed
10/19/2022Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/12/2023At IssueReady for disposition on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Steenrod, DaleAppellantMr. Keith L. Kleinhans
Ms. Kimberly G. Kleinhans
Pidgeon, CathleneAppelleeMs. Kimberly S. Keller
Mr. John Izzo
Ms. Meredith Semler
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court
Travis
Honorable Lora J. Livingston
D-1-FM-19-005671
LaSonya Gay