Case: WR-94,251-01
WR-94,251-01
10/19/2022
11.07 HC
BENTON, JESSICA JEWEL CORIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/2023 | EXTENSION/SUPP DIS | Granted |
| ||||
10/20/2023 | ORDER DESIGNATING ISSUES |
| |||||
10/17/2023 | EXTENSION/SUPP |
| |||||
09/19/2023 | EXTENSION/SUPP DIS | Granted |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | EXTENSION/SUPP | | |||||
04/12/2023 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
04/06/2023 | 2ND REMINDER ON OVERDUE REMAND | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
03/08/2023 | REMINDER | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
11/09/2022 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
10/19/2022 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/26/2023 | HOLD | TC/ANSWER DUE |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BENTON, JESSICA JEWEL CORIN | Applicant | Aaron Spolin |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-18-01024-CR
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 6 of Dallas County
Dallas
W16-41572-X(A)