Case: 10-23-00145-CV
10-23-00145-CV
05/17/2023
Administrative Law - Summary Judgment
Blue Angel Weimaraner Rescue, Inc.
Jacob Ayars, Brandy Tillman and Schellie Ayars
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2023 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||
10/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||
08/21/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2023 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/06/2023 | Objection filed |
| |||||
11/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
11/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
10/20/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
10/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
09/14/2023 | Fee requested | Request for payment of motion fee |
| ||||
09/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/21/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
06/30/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
06/30/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/26/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/23/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/20/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
06/02/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/19/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
05/19/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
05/17/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
03/07/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
02/21/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/20/2023 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Blue Angel Weimaraner Rescue, Inc. | Appellant | Paul Francis Wieneskie Michael Scott Wilson Daren R. Van Slyke Richard Allen Cuccia II |
Ayars, Jacob | Appellee | D. Scott Cain |
Tillman, Brandy | Appellee | D. Scott Cain |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Johnson
Honorable Hon. F. Steven McClure
CC-C20210183
Tracie Miller, CSR