judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Brandon Guzman a/k/a Brandon Lucio Guzman v. The State of Texas

Case: 13-23-00281-CR
13-23-00281-CR
06/30/2023
Murder
Brandon Guzman a/k/a Brandon Lucio Guzman
The State of Texas
No
4th Court of Appeals
06/30/2023
04-23-00503-CR
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
06/30/2023
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
09/20/2023Amended brief receivedAnders
09/20/2023Anders brief filedAppellant
09/18/2023Brief received - oral argument not requestedAnders
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/27/2024Letter issued by the court
02/12/2024Document returned
01/09/2024Document returned
01/09/2024Document returned
01/08/2024Motion for extension of time to file Anders response disposedGrant motion
01/03/2024Document returned
01/02/2024Document returned
01/02/2024Document returned
01/02/2024Document returned
12/21/2023Motion for extension of time to file Anders response filed
12/18/2023Document returned
12/18/2023Document returned
12/01/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
11/30/2023Corrected document requested
11/29/2023Letter issued by the court
11/29/2023Supplemental reporters record filed
11/28/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
11/20/2023Exhibits filed
11/20/2023Reporters record filed
11/20/2023Email sent
11/20/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
11/01/2023Motion to access appellate record dispGrant motion
11/01/2023Order entered
10/23/2023Motion to access appellate record filed
09/22/2023Response filed
09/22/2023Motion to withdraw attorney disposedCarried with the case
09/22/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
09/20/2023Case ready to be set
09/20/2023Anders brief filed
09/20/2023Document filed
09/20/2023Motion to withdraw attorney filed
09/20/2023Amended brief received
09/18/2023Letter filed
09/18/2023Motion to withdraw attorney filed
09/18/2023Brief received - oral argument not requested
09/14/2023Notice of late brief
09/13/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/21/2023Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
08/15/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/14/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/12/2023Exhibits filed
07/12/2023Corrected document requested
07/05/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposed
07/05/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
07/05/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
07/05/2023Corrected document requested
07/03/2023Email sent
06/30/2023Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
06/30/2023Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
06/26/2023Sealed clerk record filed
06/26/2023Clerks record filed
06/23/2023Reporters record filed
05/24/2023Docketing statement filed
05/09/2023Trial court certification filed
05/09/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
05/09/2023Case began in court of appeals
05/05/2023Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/04/2023Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/2024StatusPro se brief due
09/20/2023At IssueAt issue
10/05/2023MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Joe D. Gonzales
Guzman, Brandon Criminal - AppellantHon. Michael D. Goains
Mr. Brandon Guzman
Trial Court Information
187th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Stephanie Boyd
2019CR10921
Mary Scopas
70 years TDCJ-ID