judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5749
A-5749
03/23/1956
Application for Writ of Error
LUTHER TRANSFER AND STORAGE, INC.
W. H. WALTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/25/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/06/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
03/23/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/28/1957Response to Motion filed
01/15/1957Motion to Correct filed
12/13/1956Motion for Rehearing
11/28/1956Dissenting opinion issued.
11/28/1956Opinion issued
10/25/1956Motion for Rehearing
10/10/1956Order from Lower Court filed
10/10/1956Previous opinion withdrawn
04/25/1956Document received (See Remarks)
04/25/1956Document received (See Remarks)
04/06/1956Response to Petition
03/23/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/23/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Luther Transfer and Storage, Inc.Petitioner
W. H. Walton, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information