judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Julius Earl Hardee v. The State of Texas

Case: 04-22-00209-CR
04-22-00209-CR
04/11/2022
Aggravated Assault
Julius Earl Hardee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
09/08/2022Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
07/13/2022Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/27/2023Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk
11/22/2023Mandate issued
11/21/2023Notice received
09/11/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals
08/25/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsEXTENSION OF TIME TO FILED GRANTED WITH NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS
07/31/2023Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/05/2023Letter issued by the court
12/13/2022Submitted
11/08/2022Set for submission on briefs
09/08/2022Case ready to be set
09/08/2022Brief filed - oral argument requested
08/09/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/09/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/2022Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/11/2022Order entered
07/11/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/30/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/10/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/10/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/13/2022Supplemental clerks record filed
05/11/2022Reporters record filed
05/04/2022No reporters record filed in criminal case
04/22/2022Docketing statement filed
04/21/2022Clerks record filed
04/11/2022Case began in court of appeals
04/11/2022Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/23/2022Notice of appeal filed in trial court
02/23/2022Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/22/2023Case StoredCase stored
11/22/2023RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasStephen B. Harpold
Hardee, Julius EarlCriminal - AppellantBrett L. Ferguson
Trial Court Information
198th Judicial District Court
Kerr
Honorable M. Rex Emerson
B20174
Paula Beaver
30 years TDCJ-ID