judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5756
A-5756
03/26/1956
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM P. GLADE, DBA GLADE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
ARTHUR E. DIETERT, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/27/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/16/1956Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/07/1956Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/07/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/21/1956Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/17/1956Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/16/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/05/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
03/26/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/29/1957Order from Lower Court filed
11/27/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/16/1956Reply to Response
11/12/1956Response to Motion filed
11/07/1956Brief in Support of Petition
11/07/1956Motion for Rehearing
10/24/1956Dissenting opinion issued.
10/24/1956Opinion issued
07/21/1956Response to Brief filed
07/17/1956Supplemental Brief filed
06/13/1956Document received (See Remarks)
05/16/1956Motion for Rehearing
04/05/1956Response to Petition
03/26/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/26/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dan SettleAmicus Curiae
William P. Glade, dba Glade Construction CompanyPetitioner
Arthur E. Dietert, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information