Case: 09-23-00401-CV
09-23-00401-CV
12/27/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Julia Ann Poff
William Poff and Gina Smith
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||
02/16/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/07/2024 | Motion for extension disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/07/2024 | Motion for extension filed |
| |||||
02/07/2024 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals |
| |||||
01/17/2024 | Response due regarding jurisdiction |
| |||||
01/12/2024 | Letter filed | | |||||
01/03/2024 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |||||
12/21/2023 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/03/2024 | Status | Docketing statement due |
01/26/2024 | Status | Fee due in this court |
02/12/2024 | Status | Court reporters record due |
03/18/2024 | Status | Response due regarding jurisdiction |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Smith, Gina | Appellee | Gwendolyn Guinn Taylor |
Poff, William | Appellee | Gwendolyn Guinn Taylor |
Poff, Julia Ann | Appellant | Julia Ann Poff |
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Liberty
Honorable Wesley Hinch
23DC-CV-00947
Kelly Kirkland