judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5773
A-5773
04/03/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE B. PARR, ET AL.
JOHN BEN SHEPPERD, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/16/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1956Order from Lower Court filed
04/16/1956Reply to Response
04/12/1956Response to Motion filed
04/07/1956Miscellaneous Motion
04/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/03/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John Ben Shepperd, et al.Respondent
George B. Parr, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information