judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMITRIACE HAWKINS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1141
Short Caption:JAMITRIACE HAWKINS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4083-08Filed Date:09/07/2010

Opening Event Date:09/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/04/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJamitriace Hawkins N
James P. ChandlerYY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY
AppelleeGregory Jones N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 7, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/27/2010RECORD INDEX (ROOM 115A SHELF A2)
09/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/10/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 29, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
12/01/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
12/01/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (Joint)
12/07/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an enlargement of time to file the brief, and the lodged brief and joint appendix ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and joint appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/07/2010APPENDIX - (JOINT)
12/07/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellees shall be filed with this court on or before January 5, 2011. (JAC) elp
01/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/4/11. no oppo
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before February 4, 2011. (JAC) elp
02/04/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
02/08/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 4/6/11
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before April 6, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW) elp
04/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/20/11
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 4/27/11
04/27/2011RECEIVED- aple's brief
04/29/2011APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF no oppo
04/29/2011RECEIVED - aple's corrected brief (d.c.)
05/04/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for extensions of time within which to file the brief, and the lodged brief, and appellee's motion for leave to file the lodged amended corrected brief, it is (MORE)
05/04/2011 ORDERED that the motions are granted to the extent that the lodged amended/corrected brief of appellees is filed. It is (MORE)
05/04/2011APPELLEES' AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
05/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
05/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/13/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/12/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee District of Columbia)
08/22/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee District of Columbia)
11/03/2011WithdrawnACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/30/2011FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee District of Columbia)
12/05/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument (joint)
02/09/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/29/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/10/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
05/15/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument
06/01/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/31/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte submitting for decision.
10/31/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Thompson, Farrell
02/08/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/04/2013FiledMandate