judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5777
A-5777
04/05/1956
Application for Writ of Error
SUPERIOR INSURANCE COMPANY
L. F. JACKSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/03/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/30/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
04/05/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/27/1956Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs
07/03/1956Motion for Rehearing
06/20/1956Opinion issued
05/09/1956Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1956Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1956Document received (See Remarks)
04/30/1956Response to Petition
04/10/1956Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
04/05/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/05/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. F. JacksonRespondent
Superior Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information