Case: 02-22-00302-CV
02-22-00302-CV
08/03/2022
Contract
AFC United Construction, LLC, U.P. Nail Salon, LLC f/k/a Onyx Nail Bar TCU, LLC d//b/a Gem Nail Spa, Thanh Q. Nguyen, Joseph Pham, and Remy Le
Onyx Nail Holdings, LLC d/b/a Onyx Nail Bar TCU, Phuc T. Nguyen, and Kendall Laughlin
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/18/2023 | Electronic reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
11/06/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
07/07/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/18/2024 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
01/18/2024 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/17/2024 | Submitted | | |||||
01/09/2024 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
12/18/2023 | Electronic reply brief filed |
| |||||
12/14/2023 | Notice filed |
| |||||
12/13/2023 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||
12/13/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/12/2023 | Certificate of conference filed |
| |||||
12/11/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/27/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/06/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/06/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
10/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/29/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
08/30/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/01/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
08/01/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
07/19/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
07/07/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
06/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
06/02/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
05/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/08/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/06/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
04/05/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
01/20/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/20/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
01/18/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/11/2023 | No settlement reached during mediation |
| |||||
12/06/2022 | Letter received |
| |||||
11/15/2022 | Motion for extension of time to conduct mediation disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/14/2022 | Motion for extension of time to conduct mediation filed |
| |||||
09/13/2022 | Motion for extension of time to conduct mediation disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/12/2022 | Motion for extension of time to conduct mediation filed |
| |||||
08/30/2022 | Mediation order entered |
| |||||
08/29/2022 | Response filed | | |||||
08/17/2022 | Deadline for parties to select mediator |
| |||||
08/17/2022 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
08/17/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/16/2022 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||
08/03/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/2024 | Status | Release to publisher |
03/28/2024 | Status | Mandate to Issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Laughlin, Kendall | Appellee | Jeff R. Boggess |
Pham, Joseph | Appellant | Robley Sicard Thomas M. Michel |
Nguyen, Phuc T. | Appellee | Lu Pham Jerry D. Bullard Scott A. Cummings |
Onyx Nail Holdings, LLC d/b/a Nail Bar TCU | Appellee | Jerry D. Bullard Scott A. Cummings Lu Pham |
AFC United Construction, LLC, U.P. Nail Salon, LLC f/k/a Onyx Nail Bar TCU, LLC d//b/a Gem Nail Spa | Appellant | Robley Sicard Thomas M. Michel |
Le, Remy | Appellant | Robley Sicard Thomas M. Michel |
Nguyen, Thanh Q. | Appellant | Robley Sicard Thomas M. Michel |
Trial Court Information
141st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John P. Chupp
141-315734-20
Court Reporter, 141st District Court