Case Information: 36291 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. CUMPLIDO (GUSTAVO) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34815 , 39349 , 43374 , 46105 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157638 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/15/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/15/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) (District Court docket entries and minutes filed under seal pursuant to order entered on 4/7/00 in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A417171). | 00-10240 | |
06/20/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order to Seal Records filed in district court on April 7, 2000. | 00-10568 | |
06/21/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 00-10599 | |
06/26/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: May 4, 2000. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. | 00-10865 | |
09/06/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On June 21, 2000 counsel for the State filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-15672 | |
09/06/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |