judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFERY LYNN SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0267)
Case Number:S-07-0267Case Docketed On:11/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JEFFERY LYNN SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEFFERY LYNN SMITH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffery Lynn SmithDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Michael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 2
Citation:199 P.3d 1052 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/19/2007Motion - Stay - other. Motion for stay of briefing or in the alternative extension of time to file brief.MotionStay - otherFinal
12/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/04/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended index from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
02/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion - Extension of time - briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/27/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel by Sylvia Lee HacklMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Tina N. Kerin on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/10/2008Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
03/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance from Michael H. Reese to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/21/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2008Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
05/02/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/02/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/23/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/05/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/02/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, seven volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Information; Volume VI, Exhibits; Volume VII, Confidential Filings.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Reese for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/11/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael H. Reese for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/11/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal