judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INDUSTRIAL BANK, N.A. V. JASON SAUNDERS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1142
Short Caption:INDUSTRIAL BANK, N.A. V. JASON SAUNDERS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB986-10Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/24/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/01/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIndustrial Bank N.A.N
Richard M. Goldberg YN
AppelleeJason Saunders N
Brian P. Murphy YN
Mark G. Griffin NN
AppelleeRegatta LLCN
Brian P. Murphy NN
Mark G. Griffin NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/22/2010 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal filed in these matters, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-1099 and 10-CV-1142 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
09/22/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, if the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/30/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (BY: INDUSTRIAL BANK) *************************10CV1099 LW
10/05/2010TMC - motion to dismiss
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX both cases
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/01/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND APPEAL NO 10CV1099 IS HEREBY DISMISSED as the notice of lis pendes was lifted and the property sold to a third party that is not before the court.... It is *****MORE*****
11/01/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (RZGLNB) (jl)
11/17/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for reconsideration and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (RZGLNB) (jl)
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellants/cross-appellees' motion to reconsider the 11/17/10 order denying their motion for reconsideration of this court's order dismissing APPEAL NO. 10CV1099, the opposition thereto and as the court has previously considered the effect of the notice of lis pendens, it is ORDERED that appellant/cross-appellees' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES/CROSS-APEPLLANTS' brief in appeal NO 10CV1142 remains due on 12/13/10. (RZGLNB) (jl)
12/13/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/13/2010APPENDIX- aplt
01/12/2011APPELLEES' BRIEF (Regatta and Saunders)
01/12/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/01/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/24/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/24/2011SUBMITTED to Thompson,Reid,Steadman.
06/09/2011VACATED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid,*Associate Judge, Retired, and Steadman, Senior Judge.) (Judge Reid's status changed to Associate Judge, Retired, on April 7, 2011.)
07/01/2011MANDATE ISSUED