Case Information: 51472 | |||
Short Caption: | AKERS VS. ROKUSEK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV26313 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-09903 | |
04/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-09906 | |
05/05/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter from appellant Montgomery Akers. | 08-11043 | |
05/20/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-12591 | |
05/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Order to Direct the Clerk of the Court to Produce and Servie the Courts Approved Form to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal Upon the Appellant. | 08-13333 | |
05/30/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13718 | |
06/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. Respondent's motion filed on May 28, 2008, is denied as moot. | 08-14645 | |
06/24/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13780 | |
06/24/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/02/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2008. | 08-13780 |