judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATRICK TERRANCE SCHLUCK v. DIANE PATRICIA SCHLUCK

Case Heading (S-07-0286)
Case Number:S-07-0286Case Docketed On:12/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:PATRICK TERRANCE SCHLUCK v. DIANE PATRICIA SCHLUCK
Full Title:PATRICK TERRANCE SCHLUCK, Appellant (Defendant), v. DIANE PATRICIA SCHLUCK, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPatrick Terrance SchluckRaymond D. Macchia
Juliana Hernandez
AppelleeDiane Patricia SchluckMitchell E. Osborn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Marriage and Divorce - Alimony
Opinion Number:2008 WY 92
Citation:189 P.3d 877

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/10/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/24/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/10/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/31/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/08/2008Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Mr. Macchia's office. She stated they had been contacted by the Clerk of District Court to file an appellants designation of record. She was calling us to see if we needed a copy also, as Mr. Macchia was out of the office. This record was due yesterday.EventPhone CallFinal
04/10/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal