judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPARKS (LAVOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32192
Short Caption:SPARKS (LAVOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37727
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138418Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/04/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/06/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
05/26/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Rene Silvaggio; Yvonne Valentin; Mary Beth Cook.
06/08/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed Rough Draft Trancript of Proceedings: Jury Trial--2/12/98. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook.
07/17/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Rene Silvaggio; Yvonne Valentin; and Mary Beth Cook.
08/20/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including September 17, 1998, to file the Appellant's Opening Brief.
09/14/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 9/11/98).
09/14/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix Vols. 1 and 2.
09/14/1998Other Other. Filed Certificate of Service.
09/14/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings. 5/6/97; 2/3/98; 2/9/98; 2/10/98; 2/11/98; 2/17/98; 3/31/98. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin.
10/16/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: express mail-no postmark).
11/25/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 10/23/98).
03/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
03/04/1999Other Other. Case Submitted on the record and briefs this day.
03/04/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11566
08/01/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13288
08/01/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2000. 00-13288