Case Information: 55222 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (TARRELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 66878 , 66878-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C233039 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-00623 | |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 24, 2010. | 10-04091 | |
02/16/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Angela Lee stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/11/09; 7/13/09; 11/02/09. | 10-04106 | |
02/24/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-04908 | |
02/24/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-04954 | |
03/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-06961 | |
03/23/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: April 16, 2010. | 10-07617 | |
04/13/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-09551 | |
04/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-09552 | |
09/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-23195 | |
10/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25954 | |
10/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/19/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 14, 2010. | 10-25954 |