Case Information: 51473 | |||
Short Caption: | PARKS VS. SAUNDERS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF0703011 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-09918 | |
04/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-09919 | |
04/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-10766 | |
05/22/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12842 | |
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13178 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/27/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2008. | 08-13178 |