judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ODOM (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31533
Short Caption:ODOM (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37617 , 39553 , 40151 , 40594 , 42284 , 43495 , 44652 , 44754 , 46049 , 51415 , 54877 , 55642 , 57374 , 59136 , 63188 , 67949 , 68424 , 71384 , 73089
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C056663Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/02/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/12/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
12/12/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.)
12/31/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which we are unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. 2[The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court].
01/26/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Rough Draft Transcripts of Proceedings: 10/20/97; 11/3/97 and 11/19/97. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio.
02/09/1998Other Other. Filed Uncertified Rough Draft Transcript dated: February 4, 1998. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin.
02/27/1998Other Other. Filied Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in the district court on December 28, 1997.
03/24/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The clerk shall remove the fast track designation from the docket in this matter. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. 1[This court has received a rough draft transcript for the lower court proceedings. The parties may cite to these rough draft transcripts in their briefs and need not request them again in a transcript form or supplemental transcript request]. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
04/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
05/04/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including June 2, 1998, to file the Opening Brief.
06/03/1998MotionFiled Motion. Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.
06/05/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Order granting motion filed June 3, 1998. The opening brief and joint appendix shall be served and filed on or before June 16, 1998.
06/18/1998MotionFiled Motion. Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.
06/26/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall have to and including June 30, 1998, to file the opening brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.
07/02/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 6/30/98.)
07/02/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
07/31/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.)
09/02/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 8/31/98.)
09/02/1998Other Other. Case submitted on briefs this day.
09/02/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Having concluded that Odom is not entitled to relief in this matter, we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-16271
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16334
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16334