judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNEDY OIL, a Wyoming corporation v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Case Heading (S-07-0287)
Case Number:S-07-0287Case Docketed On:12/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:KENNEDY OIL, a Wyoming corporation v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Full Title:KENNEDY OIL, a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKennedy Oil, a Wyoming corporationMorris R. Massey
AppelleeDepartment of RevenueBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
Karl D. Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation - Mineral
Opinion Number:2008 WY 154
Citation:205 P.3d 999 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/12/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
12/12/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/08/2008Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
01/08/2008Event - Phone Call to Delissa Hayano at Holland and Hart advising that the Court has accepted the case and briefing has commencedEventPhone CallFinal
01/31/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/11/2008Motion - Amicus - leave to participateMotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
02/11/2008Motion - Admission pro hac vice on behalf of Judith M. MatlockMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
02/11/2008Affidavit - Other - Judith M. Matlock (attached to motion for admission pro hac vice)AffidavitOtherFinal
02/21/2008Response/Objection - Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (Department of Revenue's)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/26/2008Order - Amicus - deny participation (also denying motion for admission of nonresident attorney pro hac vice)OrderAmicus - deny participationFinal
03/05/2008Motion - Strike documents within Kennedy Oil's appellate brief appendixMotionStrikeFinal
03/05/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/18/2008Motion - Extension of time - to file reply brief and file opposition to motion to strike documents.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/18/2008Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply brief and file opposition to motion to strike documents.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/28/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/03/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Massey regarding oral argument dates. No action necessary.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Martin Hardsocg for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/08/2008Order - Denying motion to strikeOrderDenyFinal
04/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Morris Massey for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/10/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Morris R. Massey for appellant; Martin L. Hardsocg, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/31/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/23/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/22/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal