judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: MARYROSE O. NWADIKE

Case Information: 10-BG-1157
Short Caption:IN RE: MARYROSE O. NWADIKEClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN372-10Filed Date:09/15/2010

Opening Event Date:09/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentMaryrose O. Nwadike N
John O. IweanogeNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/15/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland disbarring respondent.
09/29/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland disbarring respondent from the practice of law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Colulmbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why she should not be disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
10/08/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (respondent)
10/20/2010PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION to respondent's request to stay this reciprocal proceeding pending resolution of her motion for reconsideration filed in the original disciplining jurisdiction.
10/26/2010TMC - respondent's OTSC INCLUDING motion for stay - Bar Counsel's oppo - proposed order
10/28/2010ORDER On further consideration of the certified order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland disbarring respondent from the practice of law, this court's September 29, 2010, order suspending respondent pending further action of the court and directing her to show cause why identical reciprocal discipline should not be imposed, respondent's response that requests that her time to respond to the court's order be stayed, the opposition of Bar Counsel, and it appearing that respondent has failed to file her affidavit as required by D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g), it is ORDERED that respondent shall, every thirty days, file a report with this court on the status of her motion in the Court of Appeals of Maryland. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent remains suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of these proceedings. (RD,TE,KG)
01/06/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the United States District Court for the District of Maryland suspending respondent.
03/10/2011LETTER from respondent advising the court that the Court of Appeals of Maryland denied respondent's motion for reconsideration, consents to disbarment nunc pro tunc to the disbarment of the Maryland Court of Appeals.
03/14/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file statement regarding reciprocal discipline. (no opposition)
03/17/2011ORDER On consideration of Bar Counsel's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file Bar Counsel's statement regarding reciprocal discipline, it is ORDERED that Bar Counsel's motion is granted and Bar Counsel's statement regarding reciprocal discipline shall be filed on or before March 23, 2011. (JAC)
03/23/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline
03/25/2011TMC - court's OTSC - court's order suspending respondent's ... - respondent's notice that reconsideration was denied - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
03/31/2011DischargedDISBARMENT ORDERED that Maryrose O. Nwadike, Esquire is hereby disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as she files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (RD,TE,KG)
04/14/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of non filing by respondent the required affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.