Case Information: 55240 | |||
Short Caption: | GREENALCH (JOSEPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C256664 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-00928 | |
01/12/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-00929 | |
01/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00930 | |
02/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days or Rough draft transcript request and case appeal statement due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-02668 | |
02/22/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/03/09. | 10-04775 | |
02/25/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 3/4/10. | 10-05088 | |
03/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Sanction and Striking Fast Track Statement. The sanction has not been vacated. Reiff: 10 days to pay $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the fast track statement. Appellant: Fast track statement and appendix due: 15 days. Fn1[The clerk of this court shall file the documents received on February 25, 2010.] | 10-05771 | |
03/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-05011 | |
03/04/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy for Request for Rough Draft Transcript. (Clark County DA and Court Reporter Esparza). | 10-05012 | |
04/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-09525 | |
04/26/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-10764 | |
04/26/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | ||
04/27/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Fast Track Statement and Appendix. | 10-10851 | |
04/27/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Payment of Sanction. Proof of Payment of $500.00 sanction from Joseph Reiff. (Bank of America cashier's check no. 003432030). | 10-10852 | |
05/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-12550 | |
05/17/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-12692 | |
05/17/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-12693 | |
05/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. CD-ROM version of appellant's appendix due: 15 days. | 10-13402 | |
06/23/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or CD-ROM version of the appendix due: 10 days. | 10-16388 | |
06/30/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -CD-ROM containing appellant's appendix. | 10-17038 | |
09/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-23114 | |
10/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25766 | |
10/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-25766 |