Case Information: 55247 | |||
Short Caption: | JAFBROS, INC. VS. GEICO INDEMNITY CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 57058 , 57524 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0902156 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Justice Saitta for Justice Hardesty Justice Hardesty for Justice Parraguirre Justice Douglas for Justice Saitta | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 01/15/2010 / Hamilton, Paul | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/28/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-01046 | |
01/13/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will b e fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/15/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul F. Hamilton | 10-01308 | |
01/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rands & South. Check No. 6440. | ||
02/01/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Brian A. Gonsalves. | 10-02717 | |
02/02/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02874 | |
02/04/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 10-03080 | |
02/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Response to Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | 10-03088 | |
02/04/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Response to Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 10-03172 | |
03/24/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/25/10 | 10-07708 | |
04/15/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-09859 | |
04/21/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-10419 | |
04/28/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-10867 | |
07/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 19, 2010. | 10-18758 | |
08/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-21446 | |
08/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Received CD-ROM 08/23/10. | 10-21447 | |
09/22/2010 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 10-24362 | |
10/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief to December 8, 2010. | 10-27779 | |
11/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File the Reply Brief. We construe the parties' stipulation as a motion and grant it. Reply brief due December 8, 2010. | 10-30944 | |
12/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-32058 | |
01/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 11-02840 | |
01/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/08/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Postpone Decision Until After Determination of Motion to Consolidate. | 11-04088 | |
02/22/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Postpone. | 11-05476 | |
03/04/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Motion to Postpone Decision Until After Determination of Motion to Consolidate. | 11-06645 | |
03/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part Motion to Consolidate and Denying Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule. We grant American Family's unopposed motion to consolidate Docket Nos. 57058 and 57524. We deny American Family's motion to consolidate those appeals with Docket No. 55247. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 5, 2011 in Docket Nos. 57058/57524. Nos. 55247/57058/57524. | 11-07522 | |
07/18/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-21519 | |
07/26/2011 | Motion | Filed Verified Bill of Costs. | 11-22471 | |
08/10/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Costs. The request for costs is denied. | 11-24152 | |
08/15/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-24772 | |
08/15/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/29/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 25, 2011. | 11-24772 |