Case Information: 55248 | |||
Short Caption: | PATTISON (DANTE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46610 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C174026 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/17/2011 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-01139 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 10-03480 | |
02/11/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-03799 | |
02/18/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/04/09 and 9/14/09. To Court Reporter: Jessica Ramirez. | 10-04436 | |
02/19/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04548 | |
03/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/14/09, 11/4/09. | 10-05995 | |
05/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. | 10-12733 | |
05/18/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 12, 2010. | 10-12857 | |
07/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-17862 | |
07/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 2, 2010. | 10-18605 | |
08/02/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-19849 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 | 10-19852 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 | 10-19853 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2,Part 3. | 10-19882 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 | 10-19858 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4 | 10-19859 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5 | 10-19861 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6 | 10-19862 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7 | 10-19880 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8 | 10-19885 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9 | 10-19887 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10 | 10-19890 | |
08/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11 | 10-19891 | |
09/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time. (Answering Brief). | 10-22483 | |
09/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion to extend time to file answering brief has been approved. Brief due: October 1, 2010. | 10-22484 | |
10/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-25477 | |
11/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (64 days). | 10-28455 | |
11/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: January 4, 2011. | 10-28958 | |
01/04/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | 11-00389 | |
01/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: February 14, 2011. | 11-00803 | |
02/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 11-04820 | |
02/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision | ||
07/13/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-20995 | |
08/09/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-23961 | |
08/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
08/18/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2011. | 11-23961 |