judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACON VS. D.T.G. OPERATIONS, INC. C/W 55570

Case Information: 55225
Short Caption:BACON VS. D.T.G. OPERATIONS, INC. C/W 55570Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:55225*, 55570 Related Case(s): 45541 , 47720 , 49132 , 55570 , 55670 , 55750 , 57411 , 57425 , 57525 , 57526 , 57872 , 58746 , 59285 , 68045 , 68780
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A495030Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/22/2010How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/08/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 10-00634
01/19/2010BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 10-01438
03/30/2010MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion for Consolidation of Appeal Docket Numbers 55225/55570/55670. 10-08289
03/31/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. and Directing Appellant to Properly Served Notice of Appeal. Record due: 30 days. Appellant's Certificate of Service due: 30 days. 10-08344
04/08/2010Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Proof of Service of NOA. 10-09187
04/22/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 10-10506
04/22/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/20/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Dismiss in Docket No. 55670, Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 55670, Consolidating Docket Nos. 55225 and 55570, Directing Service, and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Supplemental Record. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption for Docket No. 55225 on this court's docket to conform with the caption on this order. Appellant's certificate of service of NOA (docket no. 55225) due: 20 days. Supplemental Record (docket no. 55225) due: 30 days. Nos. 55225/55570/55670. 10-18586
07/28/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to File the Certificate of Service. Nos. 55225/55570 (DETACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND FILED 8/20/10). 10-19515
07/28/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Supplement the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-19519
07/30/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Response to Order Dated 7/20/10. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-19691
08/02/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents DTG Operations, Inc. and Thrifty/Dollar Rental Inc.'s Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement Filed, 02/17/10. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-19831
08/02/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents DTG Operations, Inc. and Thrifty/Dollar Rental Inc.'s Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to File the Certificate of Service that the Proper Person Notice of Appeal Was Served. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-19835
08/11/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. -Respondent Mike Brooks and United Road Service, Inc. dba Quality Towing's Joinder to Respondents DTG Operations & Thrifty/Dollar Rental, Inc.'s Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement Filed 2/17/10. Nos. 55225/55570/55670. 10-20797
08/13/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Plaintiff Respond to the Respondent Opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-21017
08/20/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Motions. We grant the motion to file the certificate of service. The clerk of this court shall file the certificate of service provisionally received in this court on July 28, 2010. We deny the motion to supplement the civil proper person appeal statement. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-21414
08/20/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate of Service. Nos. 55225/55570 (10-21419). 10-21419
09/10/2010MotionFiled Person Motion. Motion for Leave and Motion for Reconsideration by This Court to Revisit the Motion to Allow a Lack of Jurisdiction Claim to be Brought to the Attention of the Court for the First Time. 10-23283
09/17/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents DTG Operations, Inc. And Thrifty/Dollar Rental Inc.s Response to Appellant's Motion For Leave and Motion For Reconsideration By This Court To Revisit The Motion To Allow A Lack Of Jurisdiction Claim to be Brought to the Attention of the Court for the First Time. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-23981
09/20/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents Mike Brooks and United Road Service dba Quality Towing's Joinder to Respondents DTG Operations and Thrifty/Dollar's Response to Appellant's Motion for Leave and Motion for Reconsideration. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-24078
09/29/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Pro Se, Plaintiff's Respond to the Defendant D.T.G. Operations Opposition. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-25201
10/25/2010Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Judicial Notice. 10-27902
11/03/2010MotionFiled Motion to Strike. United Road Service and Mike Brooks' Motion to Strike Appellant's Motion for Judicial Notice. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-28779
11/04/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Respondent DTG Operations, Inc. and Thrifty/Dollar Rental Inc.'s Joinder to Respondents United Road Service, Inc. and Mike Brooks' Motion to Strike Appellant's Motion for Judicial Notice. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-28873
11/22/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Proper Persona Reply to the Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Judicial Notice. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-30558
12/09/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. ". . . we necessarily affirm that award." fn1[We deny all pending motions as moot.] 10-32182
12/20/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-33262
12/21/2010Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Pro Se Petition for Judicial Notice Base of Lack of Personal Jurisdiction of the Eighth Judicial District Court in Case No. A-495030. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-33361
12/28/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1 [in light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's December 21, 2010, motion for judicial notice. Nos. 55225/55570. 10-33886
01/10/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person En Banc Reconsideration. 11-01004
02/23/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. 11-05677
03/21/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 55225/55570 11-08595
03/21/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 55225/55570
04/05/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 28, 2011. Nos. 55225/55570 11-08595