Case Information: 55226 | |||
Short Caption: | PETWAY VS. VAN HOOK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D394836 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-00637 | |
01/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00638 | |
01/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Stay. | 10-01369 | |
01/15/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-01371 | |
01/15/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-01373 | |
02/04/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Notice that an application to proceed in forma pauperis is pending in the district court. | 10-03141 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP fn1[We deny appellant's motion for a stay as moot in light of this order. Appellant's failure to pay the filing fee constitutes an independent basis on which to dismiss this appeal.] | 10-06226 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-06780 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. | 10-06780 |