Case Information: 55236 | |||
Short Caption: | RIVERO (DAMIEN) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0503002 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/11/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/11/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-00842 | |
01/12/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing Respondent: Michael Bongard, Deputy Attorney General/Ely. | 10-00881 | |
01/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. Order due 35 days. | 10-01657 | |
01/28/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 1/26/10 appointing David D. Loreman, Esq. as counsel for appellant. | 10-02476 | |
01/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. David d. Loreman, Esq. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. | 10-02478 | |
02/11/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on February 9, 2010. Order Allowing Motion to Withdraw as counsel. (David Loreman allowed to withdraw as counsel for appellant.) | 10-03838 | |
02/11/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on February 9, 2010. Order Appointing Counsel. (Christopher Oram appointed as counsel for appellant.) | 10-03839 | |
02/11/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 10-03841 | |
02/18/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Christopher R. Oram. | 10-04455 | |
03/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-05472 | |
03/04/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-05692 | |
03/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Redesignating Appeal. We conclude that this appeal shall proceed as a fast track statement. Fast track statement and appendix due: 60 days. The clerk of this court shall provide a copy of the proper person Fast Track Statement received on January 25, 2010, to Mr. Oram and return, unfiled the original proper person Fast Track Statement. | 10-06710 | |
05/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-12723 | |
05/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 28, 2010. | 10-13020 | |
06/28/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-16747 | |
06/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-16748 | |
07/12/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-17891 | |
07/12/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-17893 | |
11/08/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-29115 | |
12/03/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-31484 | |
12/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 8, 2010. | 10-31484 |