Case Information: 55235 | |||
Short Caption: | LEYBA (DONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08CR002491B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/11/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-00771 | |
01/11/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/11/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-00772 | |
01/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (JOC 12/30/08) | 10-01367 | |
01/19/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/4/08, 11/18/08, 12/30/08. Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Filed in district court on: 1/8/10. | 10-01431 | |
01/19/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/30/08. Judgment of Conviction. | 10-01545 | |
02/02/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Zolkowski stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/18/08. | 10-02851 | |
02/02/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jackie Adams stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/4/08. | 10-02854 | |
02/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lesley Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/30/08. | 10-03153 | |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | 10-03376 | |
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | 10-03621 | |
02/22/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-04774 | |
02/22/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-04778 | |
03/15/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-06745 | |
04/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated docket sheet. | 10-09270 | |
09/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-23299 | |
10/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-26123 | |
10/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 8, 2010. | 10-26123 |