Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 10-01027 |
01/13/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
01/13/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | | 10-01062 |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gibbs, Gidne, Locher, Turner & Senet. Check No. 4245. | | |
02/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | | 10-03860 |
02/22/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-04782 |
02/23/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibits to the Docketing Statement. | | 10-04793 |
03/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates. | | 10-05769 |
03/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates. | | 10-05770 |
03/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/1/10 | | 10-06040 |
03/10/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates Served on Settlement Judge. | | 10-06359 |
04/05/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. 55246 & 55575. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 10-08769 |
06/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion, Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall remove the law firm of Mortenson & Rafie, LLP, from the docket of these appeals. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-15570 |
06/30/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/10/09 - 8/28/10. To Court Reporter: Margaret Isom. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-17026 |
07/19/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 08/13/09, 08/14/09, 08/17/09, 08/18/09, 08/19/09, 08/20/09, 08/21/09, 08/24/09, 08/25/09, 08/26/09, 08/27/09, 08/28/09, 10/21/09, 10/28/09, 12/02/09, 01/13/10, and 02/10/10. To Court Reporter: Margaret Isom. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-18501 |
07/19/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 08/13/09, 08/14/09, 08/17/09, 08/18/09, 08/19/09, 08/20/09, 08/21/09, 08/24/09, 08/25/09, 08/26/09, 08/27/09, 08/28/09, 10/21/09, 10/28/09, 12/02/09, 01/13/10, and 02/10/10. To Court Reporter: Kevin Daniel. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-18502 |
07/26/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. -addressed to Becky Pintar regarding the deposit for the amended transcript request. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-19239 |
08/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel-Jeffrey David Montez, Esq. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-20048 |
08/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel-Craig McKenzie Nicholas, Esq. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-20049 |
08/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-20063 |
08/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions to Associate Counsel. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-21396 |
08/27/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Non Payment of Appeal Deposit. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-22171 |
08/30/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Ameded Notice of Non Payment of Appeal Deposit. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-22241 |
09/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-22810 |
09/07/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits A-H to Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-22812 |
09/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Request for Clarification. | | 10-23228 |
09/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Reply to Upper Deck Company's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 10-23973 |
09/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Matt Construction's Reply to Upper Deck's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-24305 |
10/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Representing respondent Matt Construction: Law firm Buckley King in place and stead of Howard & Howard. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-27249 |
11/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing remains suspended. | | 10-30785 |
12/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-33700 |
12/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. Lee, Hernandez, Brooks, Garofalo & Blake is now Lee, Hernandez, Landrum, Garofalo & Blake, APC. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 10-33948 |
01/11/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Reply to Upper Deck Company's Response to Second Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-01105 |
03/03/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Howard & Howard in the place and stead of Buckley King as counsel for Matt Construction. | | 11-06638 |
03/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Allowing Appeals to Proceed and Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 11-08536 |
05/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Gibbs, Giden, Locher, Turner & Senet LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-13051 |
05/13/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service - Certificate of Mailing - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-14220 |
05/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Becky Ann Pintar shall have ten days from the date of this order to file in this court proof of service on appellant. We defer ruling on the motion to withdraw pending receipt of proof of service. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-14707 |
05/19/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service for Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Nos. 55246/55575. (In response to Order 5/18/11). | | 11-14771 |
05/24/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing Respondent Matt Construction. Association with Ray Lego & Assoc., Lucian Greco and Peter C. Brown/Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara. (Law Firm name change Sherman & Assoc. to Ray Lego & Assoc). | | 11-15188 |
06/15/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (Beau Sterling in Place of Becky Pintar for Appellant Upper Deck Co.). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-17792 |
06/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion For Extension Of Time - Opening Brief (First). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-17850 |
06/24/2011 | Motion | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Opposition to Upper Deck Company's Motion for Extension of Time. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-18959 |
07/01/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel-Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, LLP representing respondent Matt Construction in place and stead of Ray Lego & Associates. | | 11-19594 |
07/13/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Arco Electric's Joinder to Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Opposition to Upper Deck's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-21078 |
07/22/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 4, 2011. Fn1[Given appellant's June 15, 2011, substitution of counsel, counsel's May 3, 2011, motion to withdraw is denied as moot. The clerk of this court shall remove from this court's docket Gibbs, Giden, Locher, Turner & Senet LLP as counsel for appellant.] Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-22108 |
07/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time - Opening Brief (Second). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-22763 |
08/08/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule, or in the Alternative, for Extension of Time - Opening Brief (Second). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-23907 |
08/08/2011 | Motion | Filed HGP's Opposition to Upper Deck Company's Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-23911 |
08/10/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder Arco Electric's Joinder to Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Opposition to Upper Deck's Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-24231 |
08/10/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Arco Electric's Joinder to Matt Construction's Opposition to Upper Deck's Motion to Reset Briefling Schedule, or in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). | | 11-24240 |
08/12/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Preparation of the Transcripts and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. Court Reporters Margaret Isom and/or Kevin Daniel Certificate of Delivery due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-24578 |
08/29/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/13/09, 08/14/09, 08/17/09, 08/18/09, 08/19/09, 08/20/09, 08/21/09, 08/24/09, 08/25/09, 08/26/09, 08/27/09, 08/28/09, 10/21/09, 10/28/09, 12/02/09, 01/13/10, and 02/10/10. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-26181 |
09/09/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: September 19, 2011. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-27399 |
09/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time (Upper Deck). (Opening Brief and Appendix) Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-28619 |
09/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 14, 2011. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-29538 |
09/29/2011 | Motion | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Opposition to Upper Deck Company's Motion for Extension of Time - Opening Brief (Fourth Request Mislabelled as Second Request) and Motion for Dismissal of Appeal. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-29734 |
09/29/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition to HGP's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-29778 |
10/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Reply to Upper Deck Company's Opposotion to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-30526 |
10/17/2011 | Motion | Filed Matt Construction LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32036 |
10/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Appeal, Counter-Motion To Suspend Briefing Temporarily, And Request For Leave To Use Uncertified Transcripts In Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32083 |
10/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vols 1 thru 18 (via FTP). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32089 |
10/18/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Deisgn Associates' Joinder to Matt Construction, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32127 |
10/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Opposition to Upper Deck Company's Counter-Motion to Suspend Briefing and Request for Leave to Use Uncertified Transcripts in Appellant's Appendix and Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32214 |
10/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Upper Deck's Counter-Motion to Suspend Briefing Temporarily and Request for Leave to Use Uncertified Transcripts in Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32398 |
10/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Matt Construction, LLC's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Matt Construction's Opposition to Upper Deck's Counter-Motion to Suspend Briefing Temporarily and Request for Leave to Use Uncertified Transcripts in Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-32455 |
10/20/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Joinder to Matt Construction, LLC's Reply to Upper Deck Company's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. | | 11-32510 |
11/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions to Dismiss and Granting Countermotion for an Extension of Time. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's proposed opening brief received on October 19, 2011. Answering Briefs due: 30 days. fn1[Since appellant acknowledges that the certified transcript was filed in the district court on October 18, 2011, we direct appellant to supplement its appendix with the certified transcript and to file and serve the supplemental appendix within seven days from the date of this order.] Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-35023 |
11/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (Upper Deck). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-35025 |
11/23/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 19 (Supplemental). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-36286 |
12/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Herbert Gordon Press Design and Associates: Answering Brief due: December 21, 2011. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-38232 |
12/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Arco Electric of Nevada and Matt Construction: Answering Brief due: December 21, 2011. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-38465 |
12/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent Herbert Gordon Press Design and Associates Answering Brief. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-39287 |
12/21/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | | 11-39288 |
12/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Matt Construction, LLC's Answering Brief. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-39322 |
12/21/2011 | Appendix | Filed Matt Construction, LLC's Respondent Appendix. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 11-39323 |
12/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent Arco Electric's Answering Brief. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 11-39326 |
01/17/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). Nos. 55246/55575. | | 12-01621 |
01/17/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion Approved. Reply due February 21, 2012. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 12-01625 |
02/22/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Combined Reply Brief. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 12-05649 |
02/22/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
02/28/2012 | Motion | Filed Matt Construction, LLC's Motion to Strike Upper Deck Company's Reply Brief. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 12-06261 |
02/28/2012 | Motion | Filed Upper Deck's Opposition to Motion to Strike Reply Brief. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 12-06395 |
03/09/2012 | Motion | Filed Matt Construction, LLC's Reply in support of Its Motion to Strike upped Deck Company's Reply Brief. | | 12-07647 |
04/10/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief. We also deny respondent's further request that, in the event that oral argument is held in this appeal, appellant be denied the right to present a rebuttal argument. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 12-11414 |
11/08/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in these consolidated appeals, and they stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 12-35370 |
11/08/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
11/14/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Firm Name Change. (Cisneros Marias f/k/a Cisneros, Clayson & Marias). | | 12-35976 |
12/20/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Nos. 55246/55575. SNP12-MD/MG/RP. | | 12-40333 |
01/03/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Bill of Costs. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 13-00240 |
01/04/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Arco Electric's Bill of Costs Incurred on Appeal. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 13-00381 |
01/04/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Matt Construction, LLC's Bill of Costs Incurred on Appeal Through Cooksey, Toolen, Gage, Duffy & Woog, APC. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 13-00382 |
01/04/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Herbert Gordon Press Design Associates' Amended Bill of Costs. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 13-00383 |
01/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Petition for Rehearing and to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. | | 13-01268 |
01/29/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant filed a motion seeking a 21-day extension of time to file a petition for rehearing and requesting that issuance of the remittitur be stayed. We deny appellant's motion. The remittitur shall issue in the normal course. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 13-02967 |
01/29/2013 | Motion | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Petition for Rehearing | | 13-03051 |
02/04/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant has filed a notice, indicating that it wishes to withdraw its January 11, 2013, motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. We take no action on the notice of withdrawal and no further action on the already denied motion for an extension of time. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 13-03531 |
02/04/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $477.00. Nos. 55246/55575 | | 13-03533 |
02/04/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $500.00. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 13-03534 |
02/04/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $36.62. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 13-03535 |
02/04/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of costs and disburements allowed and taxed in the amount of $477.00; $500.00; and $36.62. Nos. 55246/55575. | | 13-03537 |
02/14/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 11, 2013. | | 13-03537 |