Case Information: 55227 | |||
Short Caption: | FAGEN DEVELOPMENT VS. DIST. CT. (ISERN) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51018 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV23918 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Brooke Shaw Zumpft--check no. 32683. | ||
01/08/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 10-00671 | |
01/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vols. 1 and 2 | 10-00673 | |
01/14/2010 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/09/10). Objection of the Real Parties in Interest, James R. Isern Pro Se, Elizabeth A. Isern Pro Se and Melody Fletcher Pro Se, to Petitioners' Verfied Petiton for Writ of Mandamus to the Fifth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, in and for the County of Nye and the Honorable John P. Davis. | 10-01264 | |
02/04/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Petitioners' Supplement to Verified Petition for Writ of Mandamus to the Fifth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, In and For the County of Nye and the Honorable John P. Davis | 10-03134 | |
02/04/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Petitioners' Appendix Volume 3 | 10-03135 | |
02/12/2010 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/09/10). Objection of the Real Parties in Interest, James R. Isern Pro se, Elizabeth A. Isern Pro se and Melody Flectcher Pro se, to Petitioners' Supplement to Verified Petition for Writ of Mandamus to the Fifth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, In and for the County of Nye and the Honorable John P. Davis. | 10-03885 | |
04/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "We deny the petition." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn1[As we deny this petition, and no answer from real parties in interest was directed, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the January 14, 2010, objection to this petition and the February 12, 2010. objection to the supplement to the petition.] | 10-09354 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-10015 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |