Case Information: 51466 | |||
Short Caption: | WORTH GROUP VS. SMITH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A557728 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/22/2008 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/03/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd. check no. 37159. | ||
04/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09836 | |
04/22/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 08-10018 | |
05/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-10997 | |
05/13/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 08-11901 | |
05/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. On Settlement Judge for Response to Docketing Statement. | 08-11903 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/5/08. | 08-13472 | |
06/12/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-14942 | |
06/19/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15777 | |
07/03/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/2/08. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. | 08-17001 | |
07/21/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/2/08. Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. | 08-18778 | |
07/21/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/2/08. | 08-18781 | |
09/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 17, 2008. | 08-23823 | |
10/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-26736 | |
10/16/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-26738 | |
11/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 24, 2008. | 08-29363 | |
11/18/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-29335 | |
11/18/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-29336 | |
12/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-32003 | |
02/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 09-02996 | |
02/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/04/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-29428 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30372 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. | 09-30372 |